Gundrum, Susan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 65553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
672 B Main St
Sauble Beach ON  N0H 2G0
Phone: (519) 422-1321
Fax: (519) 422-3568
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN ELIZABETH GUNDRUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNDRUM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993