Gunnarsson, Thorsteinn (CPSO#: 78285)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Aug 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Icelandic, Swedish

Education:University of Iceland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thorsteinn Gunnarsson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Iceland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Aug 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 28 Feb 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 28 Feb 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  February  28, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation  on  the  certificate   of   registration  held  by  Dr.  Thorsteinn
            Gunnarsson,  in  accordance  with  an undertaking  and  consent  given  by  Dr.
            Gunnarsson to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Gunnarsson has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario. 
                  
            The certificate of registration held  by Dr. Thorsteinn Gunnarsson also carries
            the  following  term,  condition and limitation  imposed  by  the  Registration
            Committee, effective August 30, 2007.

            1.    Dr. Thorsteinn Gunnarsson may practise medicine only,

                  (I)   in a setting  that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division  of  Neurosurgery,   McMaster  University,  in  which  Dr.
                        Gunnarsson holds an academic appointment  at  the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Gunnarsson
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.