Gunz, Anna Catherine (CPSO#: 88506)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pediatric Critical Care
C2-847
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 53360
Fax: (519) 685-9766
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AC Gunz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gunz ( CPSO# 88506 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
Pediatric Critical Care
Room C2-841
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA CATHERINE GUNZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 07 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2012