Guo, Hans Chung-Teh (CPSO#: 70180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Doctor's Office
255 Morningside Avenue
Scarborough, Ontario
Toronto ON  M1E 3E6
Phone: (416) 284-1020
Fax: (416) 284-1271
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

250 Wincott Drive
Weston ON  M9R 2R5
Canada
Phone: (416) 249-0002
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

80 Thickson Road South
Whitby ON  L1N 7T2
Canada
Phone: (905) 668-6448
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANS CHUNG-TEH GUO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Jul 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1999