Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Guo, Lin-Rui (CPSO#: 64709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Jan 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Shanxi Medical College, Taiyun, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Surgery
LHSC University Hospital
B6-112
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3468
Fax: (519) 663-3477
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Guo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Guo ( CPSO# 64709 )

Business Address:
LHSC-Department of Surgery
339 Windermere Road
B6-112
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3468

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Apr 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 13 Apr 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 13 Apr 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Apr 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 13 Apr 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Apr 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1998
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Lin-Rui Guo may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        University  of  Western Ontario, in which Dr. Guo holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  when  Dr. Guo no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.