Gupta, Abha Anshu (CPSO#: 76628)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Haematology/Oncology
555 University Avenue
room 9215
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 8138886
Fax: (416) 813-5327
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Cancer Center
Toronto ON  M5G2C1
Canada
Phone: (416) 946-2252
Fax: (416) 813-5327
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Haematology/Oncology Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABHA ANSHU GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2004