Gupta, Aditya Kumar (CPSO#: 51858)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Feb 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Southampton, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
645 Windermere Road
London ON  N5X 2P1
Phone: (519) 657-4222 Ext. 221
Fax: (519) 657-4233
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2863 Ellesmere Road
Suite 405
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Canada
Phone: (416) 747-7873
Fax: (416) 747-7441
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.K. Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gupta ( CPSO# 51858 )

Business Address:
645 Windermere Road
London ON  N5X 2P1
Phone Number: (519) 657-4222

Business Address:
405 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 747-7873

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADITYA KUMAR GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1983