Gupta, Anil Kumar (CPSO#: 65242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albion Finch Medical Centre
Suite 106
1620 Albion Road
Toronto ON  M9V 4B4
Phone: (416) 741-1500
Fax: (416) 741-1506
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anil K. Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gupta ( CPSO# 65242 )

Business Address:
Albion Finch Medical Centre
106 - 1620 Albion Road
Toronto ON  M9V 4B4
Phone Number: (416) 741-1500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANIL KUMAR GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993