Gupta, Anjali (CPSO#: 55109)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: Sostarec, Anjali (used until: 20 Dec 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anjali Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gupta ( CPSO# 55109 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANJALI GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 May 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1985