Gupta, Ankur (CPSO#: 94144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2017

Expiry Date:  20 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 01 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Maharshi Dayanand University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
Division of Nephrology
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANKUR GUPTA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. GUPTA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. GUPTA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GUPTA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. GUPTA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. GUPTA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. GUPTA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 20 Jan 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 12 Jul 2010 to 03 Sep 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 04 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jan 2018
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Jan 2018