Gupta, Anup Kumar (CPSO#: 53386)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Mar 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
751 Pape Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3T1
Phone: (416) 462-3884
Fax: (416) 462-3895
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 312
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 591-1333
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2391 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1K 2M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 750-9000
Fax: (416) 750-9004
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anup Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gupta ( CPSO# 53386 )

Business Address:
8137 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1L2
Phone Number: (416) 465-5464

Business Address:
751 Pape Avenue
Lower Level
Toronto ON  M4K 3T1
Phone Number: (416) 462-3884

Business Address:
312 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 591-1333

Business Address:
2391 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1K 2M5
Phone Number: (416) 750-9000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 30 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANUP KUMAR GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1987