Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Gupta, Deepak (CPSO#: 58310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jan 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone: (905) 953-0637
Fax: (905) 953-0943
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 210
4949 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M2R 1Y1
Canada
Phone: (416) 221-9001
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

28 South Unionville Ave
Unionville ON  L3R 1J5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deepak Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gupta ( CPSO# 58310 )

Business Address:
2128 - 28 South Unionville Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 301-6622

Business Address:
Suite 101
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone Number: (905) 953-0637

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEEPAK GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1990