Gupta, Gaurav Vinod (CPSO#: 99481)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Oct 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nottingham, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 46368
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Gupta ( CPSO# 99481 )

Business Address:
HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 05 Oct 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Apr 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Apr 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Gaurav  Vinod  Gupta  may  practise  medicine  independently  in emergency
            medicine, only.