Gupta, Gaurav (CPSO#: 82925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces
Health Services Centre Ottawa
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 945-1601
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gaurav Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Gupta ( CPSO# 82925 )

Business Address:
Canadian Forces
Health Services Centre Ottawa
Monfort Campus - Physical Medicine and Rehab
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 945-1133

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAURAV GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010