Gupta, Inder Paul (CPSO#: 65963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Maharshi Dayanand University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
683 Greath Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5A1
Phone: (705) 254-7009
Fax: (705) 254-7856
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INDER PAUL GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Sep 1992 to 28 Sep 1992
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Sep 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996