Gupta, Indra Rani (CPSO#: 60089)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Names: Hammond, Indra Rani (used until: 03 Jul 1991 )     Gupta, Indra (used until: 13 Jul 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Dec 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 1998