Gupta, Kaveri (CPSO#: 81177)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Inland Hospital
311 Columbia Street
Kamloops, BC
V2C 2T1
Kamloops BC  V2C 2T1
Phone: 250-374-5111
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kaveri Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gupta ( CPSO# 81177 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Hospital
Room B3-412
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 663-3849

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAVERI GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 Jan 2010
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 05 Oct 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010