Gupta, Madhulika Agarwal (CPSO#: 31206)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1979

Summary

Former Name: Agarwal, Madhulika (used until: 20 Jul 1982 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
585 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 1H3
Phone: (519) 641-1001
Fax: (519) 641-1033
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gupta ( CPSO# 31206 )

Business Address:
101 - 585 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 1H3
Phone Number: (519) 641-1001

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom
USA - California
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MADHULIKA AGARWAL GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1979