Gupta, Malati (CPSO#: 50651)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Apr 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:Bihar University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction & Mental
Health
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32673
Fax: (416) 583-1279
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALATI GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1997