Gupta, Milan Krishan (CPSO#: 59616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1989

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
3 Conestoga Drive
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone: (905) 495-4278
Fax: (905) 452-1052
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milan Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gupta ( CPSO# 59616 )

Business Address:
200 - 3 Conestoga Drive
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone Number: (905) 495-4278

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  October 3, 2012
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On October 12, 2012, William Osler Health System notified the College that Dr. Milan K. Gupta's privileges were suspended, effective October 3, 2012.

William Osler Health System subsequently notified the College of its decision to revoke Dr. Milan K. Gupta's privileges, effective July 31, 2014.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILAN KRISHAN GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989