Gupta, Mona (CPSO#: 69026)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHUM - Saint Luc
1058 rue Saint Denis, 6ème sud
Departement de Psychiatrie
Montreal QC  H2X 3J4
Phone: (514) 890-8000 Ext. 36155

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONA GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2000