Gupta, Nandini (CPSO#: 98571)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
237 Barton Street
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANDINI GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 2017