Gupta, Neeru (CPSO#: 64236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Cardinal Carter Wing
Suite 8-072
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5444
Fax: (416) 864-5208
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Gupta and Yucel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Yucel ( CPSO# 65714 )
Dr. N. Gupta ( CPSO# 64236 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Cardinal Carter Wing
Suite 8-072
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5444

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
209 LKSKI, Room 409
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 25 Oct 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEERU GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1992