Gupta, Pratyush (CPSO#: 94396)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Delhi, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2010 to 19 Oct 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2011