Gupta, Rajiv (CPSO#: 66591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
302 - 100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone: (416) 745-2038
Fax: (416) 742-2139
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajiv Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gupta ( CPSO# 66591 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 745-2038

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJIV GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998