Gupta, Rasna (CPSO#: 96656)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Aug 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Government Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
WIndsor Regional Cancer Centre
Medical Oncology Associates Group
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rasna Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gupta ( CPSO# 96656 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
Medical Oncology Associates Group
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone Number: (519) 253-5253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Aug 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 25 Aug 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 24 Feb 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 19 Feb 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Feb 2013 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Rasna Gupta may practise medicine independently in internal medicine
                  and medical oncology, only.