Gupta, Samir (CPSO#: 71777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone: (416) 291-7719
Fax: (416) 287-3775
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Dermatology
180 Sandalwood Parkway East
Brampton ON  L6Z 1Y4
Canada
Phone: 905-846-9255
Fax: 905-846-2525
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

The MCI DERMATOLOGY CENTRE
200 Windflower Gate, Unit 700
Woodbridge ON  L4L 9L3
Canada
Phone: 905-856-2100
Fax: 905-856-2101
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samir Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gupta ( CPSO# 71777 )

Business Address:
180 Sandalwood Parkway East
Brampton ON  L6Z 1X4
Phone Number: (905) 846-9255

Business Address:
100-1333 Neilson Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 22 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMIR GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1997