Gupta, Sanjiv (CPSO#: 79115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4576
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sanjiv Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gupta ( CPSO# 79115 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJIV GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008