Gupta, Saurabh (CPSO#: 107137)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Oct 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Cardiac Surgery
Room 8N01
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Electoral District: 04

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Oct 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr. Saurabh Gupta shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate
                  medical  education  program  in  which  Dr. Gupta is enrolled at McMaster
                  University.

            (2)   In Dr. Gupta's practice in the postgraduate  medical  education  program,
                  Dr. Gupta shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a
                  clinical  teaching  unit  that is formally affiliated with the department
                  where Dr. Gupta is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate
                  trainees are regularly assigned  by the department as part of its program
                  of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In Dr. Gupta's practice in the postgraduate  medical  education  program,
                  Dr. Gupta shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. Gupta may practise adult critical care medicine and to the extent  of
                  his  employment  at  Hamilton  Health  Sciences  Corporation, while under
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            (5)   In Dr. Gupta's practice specified in paragraph (4),  Dr.  Gupta  may  not
                  charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This  certificate  of  registration expires, and Dr. Gupta must thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when Dr. Gupta is  no  longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate
                        medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when  Dr. Gupta no longer  holds  Canadian  citizenship,  permanent
                        resident  status,  or  a  valid  employment authorization under the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically  converts   to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education certificate and Dr.  Gupta must immediately  cease all practice
                  outside  the  postgraduate medical education program if any  one  of  the
                  following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisor  identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of
                        any concerns regarding  Dr.  Gupta's  practice,  including  but not
                        limited   to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Gupta's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval   for  Dr.   Gupta  to  engage  in  practice  outside  the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when Dr. Gupta's  employment  as specified in paragraph (4) ceases;
                        or
                  
                  (e)   if  Dr. Gupta takes a leave of absence,  or  transfers  to  another
                        program,  from  the  postgraduate  education  program  specified in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In   the   event  of  conversion  to  a  regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7)  or  expiry  of  the certificate under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Gupta  may  not  resume  any practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate medical education program under the  restricted registration
                  for  residents policy until Dr. Gupta applies for a  new  certificate  of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This certificate  is  issued  on  October  5,  2017.   In accordance with
                  paragraph  6(a),  this certificate of registration expires  on  June  30,
                  2018.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice  outside  the   postgraduate   medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.