Gur, Eyal (CPSO#: 69664)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Jul 1997
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1997