Guram, Karmdeep Singh (CPSO#: 79503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 9058131100 Ext. 4268
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2300 Eglington Ave W
G-02
Mississauga ON  L5M2V8
Canada
Phone: 9058280653
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karmdeep S. Guram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Guram ( CPSO# 79503 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-3978

Business Address:
Credit Valley Professional Building
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Room G-02
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 828-0653

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARMDEEP SINGH GURAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GURAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 May 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2005 to 31 May 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2006 to 31 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2007 to 31 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2009