Gurau, Adam Joel (CPSO#: 101301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
34 Civic Avenue
2nd Floor
Stouffville ON  L4A 1H2
Phone: (905) 640-3100
Fax: (905) 640-5346
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Baycrest Health Sciences
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Canada
Phone: 4167852500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Gurau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gurau ( CPSO# 101301)

Business Address:
34 Civic Avenue
2nd Floor
Stouffville ON  L4A 1H2
Phone Number: (905) 640-3100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM JOEL GURAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GURAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015