Gurland, Lauren Alana (CPSO#: 109495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: 519-685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN ALANA GURLAND shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GURLAND is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. GURLAND shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GURLAND is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. GURLAND shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GURLAND is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GURLAND no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 10 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018