Gurr, Kevin Robert (CPSO#: 50653)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Science Centre
1st Floor
Westminster Tower
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55360
Fax: 5196858059
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin R. Gurr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gurr ( CPSO# 50653 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Room E4
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8055

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN ROBERT GURR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GURR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1985