Gustafsson, Peter Arne Michael (CPSO#: 53300)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Karolinska Medico-Kirurgiska Institute, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988