Gutelius, John Robert (CPSO#: 26002)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1961 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1962 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2000