Gutierrez, Carlos Alfredo (CPSO#: 73272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Feb 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chaparro Mutis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chaparro Mutis ( CPSO# 68585 )
Dr. C. Gutierrez ( CPSO# 73272 )

Business Address:
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
PMB 11 -132
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4996

Business Address:
Suite 6 - 040
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Feb 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Feb 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 May 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 May 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Carlos  Alfredo  Gutierrez may practise medicine independently in internal
            medicine as a hospitalist, only.