Gutman, Michael Bentov (CPSO#: 59701)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1991 to 30 Sep 1992
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Apr 2004