Gutman, Samuel Jeffrey (CPSO#: 66276)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Oct 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2014