Guttman, Rachelle Gitel (CPSO#: 86752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Koffler Student Service Centre
Main Floor
214 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Phone: (416) 978-8030
Fax: (416) 978-7341
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHELLE GITEL GUTTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUTTMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2014