Guy, John (CPSO#: 61186)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Aug 1999