Guy, Kurt James (CPSO#: 72516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 104
386 Cambria Street
Stratford ON  N5A 1J4
Phone: (519) 272-1811
Fax: (519) 272-1822
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. James Guy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Guy ( CPSO# 72516 )

Business Address:
104 - 386 Cambria Street
Stratford ON  N5A 1J4
Phone Number: (519) 272-1811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KURT JAMES GUY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003