Guzman, Carole Anne (CPSO#: 17687)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jan 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000