Guzman, Danilo Antonio (CPSO#: 18234)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 16 Mar 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Dec 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013