Guzman Ramirez, Jaime (CPSO#: 69665)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad de Guanajuato, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 03 Oct 1997
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007