Guzowski, Ann Veronica (CPSO#: 56773)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015