Gwardjan, Andrzej Jerzy (CPSO#: 62954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1991


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Main Floor
10 Ewen Road
Hamilton ON  L8S 3C4
Phone: (905) 521-6376
Fax: (289) 768-2476
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Gwardjan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2014

Dr. A. Gwardjan ( CPSO# 62954 )

Business Address:
10 Ewen Road
Hamilton ON  L8S 3C4
Phone Number: (905) 521-6376

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton


Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 11 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ANDRZEJ JERZY GWARDJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GWARDJAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Mar 1995
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1991