Gwyn, Alice Bond Jermy (CPSO#: 97226)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hugh Allen Clinic
79 5th Avenue North
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1A8
Phone: (807) 737-3803
Electoral District: 09

Medical Records Location

Address: 79 Fifth Avenue Sioux Lookout, ON P8T 1K9
Date Received: 16 May 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALICE BOND JERMY GWYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GWYN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2016