Gyenes, Tal Ora (CPSO#: 56686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: Rosenbach, Tal Ora (used until: 26 Jul 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5927 Bathurst Street
Suite 202
North York ON  M2R 3T5
Phone: (416) 225-0095
Fax: (416) 225-0099
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 15 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAL ORA GYENES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GYENES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1992