Gyetvai, Kristen Marie (CPSO#: 74727)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1720 Howard Avenue
Suite 258
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 252-6538
Fax: (519) 252-3389
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTEN MARIE GYETVAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GYETVAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005